THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 7:20:48 AM
Jaklis, Ziad
CPSO#:
66571
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Ziad Jaklis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 7 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records location as per above.
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste. Marie, ON P6B 1Y5
Tel: (705) 759-1234
Date Received: 16 Apr 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Urology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2018 |