THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:58:39 AM
Hindocha, Sandeep Pragji
CPSO#:
66570
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
15900 Bayview Ave
Aurora ON L4G 7Y3
Phone: 9057269755
Fax: 9057269631
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDEEP PRAGJI HINDOCHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HINDOCHA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1995 |