THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 14:03:00 PM
Habib, Rami
CPSO#:
66556
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Dec 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Upper Canada Family Health Team
100 Strowger Blvd
Entrance 2B
Suite 110
Brockville ON K6V 5J9
Phone: 613-423-3333
Fax: (613) 423-3334
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMI HABIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Dec 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 1998 |