THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:31:03 AM
Ray, Joel Geoffrey
CPSO#:
66553
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 77442
Fax: 416-864-5558
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOEL GEOFFREY RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 31 Aug 1998
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1997 |