THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:00:12 PM
Macdonald, Kathryn Jean
CPSO#:
66549
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jan 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jan 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1769 Chiefswood Road
Box 160
Ohsweken ON N0A 1M0
Phone: (519) 445-2143
Fax: (519) 445-0504
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KATHRYN JEAN MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Feb 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Mar 1996 to 28 Feb 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Mar 1997 to 28 Feb 1998
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Mar 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jan 1999 |