THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:23:05 AM
Derzko-Dzulynsky, Larissa Anne
CPSO#:
66521
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish, Ukrainian
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 513
2425 Bloor St W
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 760-8763
Fax: (647) 689-2276
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LARISSA ANNE DERZKO-DZULYNSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERZKO-DZULYNSKY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |