THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:50:16 PM
Young, Scott Donald
CPSO#:
66516
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
21 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Sep 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Scott D. Young Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 16 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:10 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1997 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Jul 2021 |