THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 4:47:52 AM
Tsao, May Na-Yuan
CPSO#:
66509
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4806
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAY NA-YUAN TSAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSAO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1999 |