THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:49:06 AM
Osborne, Edward James
CPSO#:
66499
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3200
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON L1C 1P6
Phone: (905) 623-2355
Fax: (905) 623-9607
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site |
Bowmanville |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EDWARD JAMES OSBORNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OSBORNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1995 |