THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:13:32 AM
Olech, Victoria Marie
CPSO#:
66498
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300-1100 Burloak Dr
Burlington ON L7L 6B2
Phone: 18884686178
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc
111 St Regis Crescent S
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 05 Mar 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTORIA MARIE OLECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLECH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1995 |