THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:46:46 AM
Preiner, John Leonard
CPSO#:
66473
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
216-16700 Bayview Ave
Newmarket ON L3X 1W1
Phone: 905 954-0307
Fax: 905 952-0520
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN LEONARD PREINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PREINER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2000 |