THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:58:00 AM
Jamshaid, Mamoona
CPSO#:
66458
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Mar 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Mar 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
398 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0V4
Phone: (613) 244-2005
Fax: (613) 244-2004
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAMOONA JAMSHAID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMSHAID is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Nov 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Dec 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 14 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Mar 1996 |