THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 7:52:11 AM
Ibrahim, Salwa Nasry Kamel
CPSO#:
66457
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jan 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
207-3410 Sheppard Ave E
Scarborough ON M1T 3K4
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:DocuDavit Solutions
28 Eugene Street
Toronto, ON, M6B 3Z4
Phone: 1-888-781-9083 or 416-781-9083
Fax: 1-866-297-9338
Date Received: 02 Sep 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SALWA NASRY KAMEL IBRAHIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBRAHIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1996 |