THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:25:43 PM
Nicholls, Eric Herbert
CPSO#:
66438
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Whitehills Medical Centre
101-1055 Fanshawe Park Road W
London Ontario
N6G-OW7
London ON N6G 2V9
Phone: (519) 472-0040
Fax: (519) 472-7732
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ERIC HERBERT NICHOLLS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLLS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1995 |