THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:34:16 AM
McGinley, Michael Diarmuid
CPSO#:
66424
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1568 Ouellette
Windsor ON N8X 1K7
Phone: 519-256-4914
Electoral District: 01
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nuclear Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DIARMUID MCGINLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGINLEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Nuclear Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 1998 |