THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:45:23 AM
Winsor, Stephanie Heather Malaika
CPSO#:
66414
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynecology
H S C 4D9
1280 Main Street
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76253
Fax: (905) 527-2675
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHANIE HEATHER MALAIKA WINSOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINSOR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Jan 2002
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |