THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 18:41:54 PM
Hall, Ann Mary Raphaella
CPSO#:
66413
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Utovac, Ann Mary Raphaella (used until: 17 Apr 1997 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 2443
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANN MARY RAPHAELLA HALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1998 |