THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:49:10 PM
Peck, Jonathan Lamont
CPSO#:
66410
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queentario Medical Centre
2325 Hurontario Street Unit 4-B
Mississauga ON L5A 4C7
Phone: (905) 270-8307
Fax: (905) 270-6861
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JONATHAN LAMONT PECK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PECK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1995 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 31 Jan 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2019 |