THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:39:22 PM
Kosaric, Alan
CPSO#:
66398
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ophthalmic Consultant Centres
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON L4W 1W9
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:27 Nov 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALAN KOSARIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOSARIC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Apr 2008 to 20 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Apr 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 15 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 May 2010 to 15 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 16 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1995 |