THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:42:29 AM
Bishop, Monica Anne
CPSO#:
66386
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospice Renfrew
459 Albert Street
Renfrew ON K7V 1V8
Phone: 613-433-3993
Fax: 613-432-3618
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONICA ANNE BISHOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHOP is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Oct 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Nov 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2015 |