THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:58:05 PM
Babcock, Lea Janine
CPSO#:
66384
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Colborne St W
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:c/o Dr. Victoria Archer
201-119 Memorial Ave
Orillia ON L3V 5X1
Tel: (705) 326-934
Date Received: 20 Nov 2017
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1995 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEA JANINE BABCOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BABCOCK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1995 |