THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:32:15 PM
Shahi, Bahram
CPSO#:
66381
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Level 2, Unit 12
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bahram Shahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2010
Corporation Name: Bahram Shahi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Northwest Territories
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Stevenson Memorial Hospital |
Alliston |
Temiskaming Hospital |
New Liskeard |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BAHRAM SHAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1998 |