THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:41:29 AM
Hakim, Mohammad Omar
CPSO#:
66378
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Aga Khan University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1952 Bay St
Victoria BC V8R 1J8
Phone: 2503708832 Ext. 18832
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
New Brunswick
Pakistan
USA - California
USA - Florida
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: February 22, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On February 15, 2018, the North Bay Regional Health Centre (NBRHC) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33 of the Public Hospital Act and s.85.5(2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that in September 2017, Dr. Mohammed Omar Hakim withdrew his application for reappointment and therefore allowed his privileges to lapse at NBRHC effective September 30, 2017.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD OMAR HAKIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAKIM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |