THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:54:11 AM
Hamm, Caroline Marie
CPSO#:
66375
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2220 Kildare Road
Windsor ON N8W 2X3
Phone: (519) 253-5253
Fax: (519) 255-8675
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C. Hamm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2024
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Erie Shores HealthCare |
Leamington |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:10 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLINE MARIE HAMM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 1993 |