THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 22:43:39 PM
Nagpal, Sudhir Kumar
CPSO#:
66353
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Vascular Surgery
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Box 627
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:31 Oct 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:31 Oct 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUDHIR KUMAR NAGPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGPAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 1998 to 31 Oct 1999
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 1999 to 31 Oct 2000
Resident 7 - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Jul 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |