THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:05:20 AM
Vaz, Camila Maria
CPSO#:
66337
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Bombay, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
798 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON M8Z 1N5
Phone: (416) 236-1654
Fax: (416) 236-1655
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:21 Nov 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:06 Sep 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAMILA MARIA VAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1996 |