THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 0:49:26 AM
Smith, Kevin Gregory
CPSO#:
66319
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
25 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kevin G. Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 6 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton St
Port Perry ON L9L 1L9
Date Received: 02 Aug 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 May 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Jun 2018 |