THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:42:23 PM
Carvalho, Preston Manoel Milacruz Agnelo
CPSO#:
66298
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Feb 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Feb 2024
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Radiology Department
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Brampton Civic Hospital, 2100 Bovaird Drive East, Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Date Received: 13 Apr 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:10 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRESTON MANOEL MILACRUZ AGNELO CARVALHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARVALHO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2024 |