THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:54:18 PM
Vera Silva, Victor Antonio
CPSO#:
66296
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Nacional De Trujillo, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
474 College ST, Suite 206
Toronto ON M6G 1A4
Phone: (647) 350-8008
Fax: (647) 350-8009
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTOR ANTONIO VERA SILVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VERA SILVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2002 |