THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:05:20 PM
Szpindel, Isaac Ichak Eizek
CPSO#:
66287
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jul 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jul 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hebrew, Yiddish
Education: McMaster University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
32 Park Road
Toronto ON M4W 2N4
Phone: (416) 598-9344
Fax: (416) 598-8198
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ISAAC ICHAK EIZEK SZPINDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZPINDEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Apr 1993 to 02 May 1993
EL - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 May 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1993 |