THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:53:14 AM
Viljoen, Johan
CPSO#:
66263
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Mar 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Mar 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4th floor Womens and Babies
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647 Ext. 44234
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Johan Viljoen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 21 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1992 |
CFPC Specialist |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:03 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHAN VILJOEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VILJOEN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Mar 1993 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On February 3, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Viljoen.