THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:17:14 PM
Kupets, Rachel Susan
CPSO#:
66252
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
T2 001
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4378
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL SUSAN KUPETS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUPETS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Mar 1993 to 07 Apr 1993
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 09 Mar 1995 to 05 Apr 1995
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 07 Mar 1996 to 26 Apr 1996
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 16 May 1996 to 20 Jun 1996
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 03 Sep 1996 to 06 Oct 1996
EL - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Gynecologic Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Apr 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Apr 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Oct 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1997 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |