THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:28:08 PM
Beauchesne, Luc Michel
CPSO#:
66228
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Feb 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Feb 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7330
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:14 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUC MICHEL BEAUCHESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEAUCHESNE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 1993 |