THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:46:06 AM
Manuel, Douglas Geoffrey
CPSO#:
66203
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Feb 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Feb 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital Research Institute
725 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19108
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Community Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS GEOFFREY MANUEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANUEL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Community Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 1993 |