THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:39:00 PM
Morton, Gerard Christopher
CPSO#:
66201
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Apr 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6165
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 May 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GERARD CHRISTOPHER MORTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 1996 |