THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:28:03 PM
Hu, Weimin
CPSO#:
66199
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Hebei Medical College, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2H323 - 2200 Eglington Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 2767
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WEIMIN HU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1998 |