THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:12:34 AM
Wong, Florence Suet Hing
CPSO#:
66157
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 1993
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
9EB 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3834
Fax: (416) 340-5019
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:01 Oct 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. FLORENCE SUET HING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 1993 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1996 |