THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:11:57 PM
Ducros, Genevieve Marie
CPSO#:
66156
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Dec 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Dec 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
8 Wing CFB Trenton
24 Canadian Forces Hosp Serv
PO Box 1000
50 Yukon Street
Astra ON K0K 3W0
Phone: (613) 392-2811 Ext. 3480
Fax: (613) 965-7214
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1993 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MARIE DUCROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUCROS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Feb 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 1993 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 May 1993 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1993 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2006 |