THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:21:52 PM
Chiu, Arthur Kwok-Kwong
CPSO#:
66149
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
2901 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2T3
Phone: (416) 269-5808
Fax: (416) 269-5803
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:11 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Dec 1992 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member |
Effective: 05 Jun 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 10 Jul 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
member |
Effective: 10 Jul 2019 |
|
Active |
Concerns
Source:
FSMB (USA)
Notice Type Discipline Findings in Other Jurisdictions
Active Date: March 17, 2017
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
On March 17, 2017, the Medical Board of California, with the agreement of Dr. Kwok-Kwong Chiu, made an order effective April 14, 2017 placing Dr. Chiu on probation for three years. The terms of the probation ordered by the Medical Board of California include requirements to successfully complete a clinical training or educational program, practice under an approved practice monitor, not engage in the solo practice of medicine and not supervise physician assistants. This order was made as a result of the action taken against Dr. Chiu by the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, which is a cause for discipline under the California Business and Professions Code. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated March 23, 2017.