THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:17:00 AM
Kolodziej, Alexander William
CPSO#:
66117
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services Ctr
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-1082
Fax: (613) 945-1070
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:16 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER WILLIAM KOLODZIEJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOLODZIEJ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
CF - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 15 Apr 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Apr 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2004 |