THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 15:30:13 PM
Simantirakis, Emmanuel
CPSO#:
66086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Nov 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Nov 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Greek
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Radiology Department
713 Montreal Road
Vanier ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4527
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL SIMANTIRAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMANTIRAKIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 1992 |