THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:01:26 PM
Yeung, Kam-Tong
CPSO#:
66084
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Nov 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4B, 4773 Yonge Street
Toronto ON M2N 0G2
Phone: 647-348-2218
Fax: 647-348-2298
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Providence Health Care,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Dec 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:20 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAM-TONG YEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEUNG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 1997 |