THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 16:16:59 PM
Wang, Chen
CPSO#:
66082
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Jiamusi Medical College, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Pathology and Lab Medicine
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4469
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:06 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHEN WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 05 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 02 Nov 1993
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 03 Nov 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 02 Nov 1994
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 03 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 02 Nov 1995
Resident 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 03 Nov 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 02 Nov 1996
Resident 4 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 03 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1997 |