THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 5:19:08 AM
Orfi, Jan Niel Ezel
CPSO#:
66046
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300-1
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
Phone: (905) 849-4567 Ext. 6
Fax: (905) 338-3607
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:03 Feb 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAN NIEL EZEL ORFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ORFI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Cardiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 1992 |