THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:10:34 AM
Rodger, Marc Alan
CPSO#:
65977
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Jun 1993
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marc Rodger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 1 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, Ontario K1H8L6
Date Received: 14 Apr 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:12 Sep 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 04 Nov 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 05 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Hematology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Sep 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1993 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |