THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 9:56:53 AM
Vu, John Thien-An
CPSO#:
65946
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1290 Keith Ross Dr
Oshawa ON L1J 0C7
Phone: 905-721-2182
Fax: 905-721-6186
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Oct 2014 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN THIEN-AN VU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 1992 |