THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:20:57 AM
Kyrollos, Adel George Halim
CPSO#:
65936
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Dec 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Dec 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
108-117 Centrepointe Dr
Priya Medical Centre
117 Centrepointe Drive
Unit 108
Nepean ON K2G 5X3
Phone: 613-226-2100
Fax: 833-965-0882
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
USA - Michigan
USA - Pennsylvania
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cornwall Community Hospital |
Cornwall |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADEL GEORGE HALIM KYROLLOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KYROLLOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 04 Aug 1996
Resident 4 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Aug 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2001 |