THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:35:42 AM
Hamed, Azza Abdel Wahab
CPSO#:
65885
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
250 Dundas St W
Mississauga ON L5B 1J2
Phone: (905) 268-0385
Fax: (905) 268-0567
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:23 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AZZA ABDEL WAHAB HAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 27 Jul 1992 to 22 Aug 1992
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1992 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Aug 1992 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2000 |