THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:03:17 AM
Un, Victor Chi Chung
CPSO#:
65882
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Aug 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Aug 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Dept of Anesthesia
Room 1E-174
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 4167566520
Fax: 8557563454
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTOR CHI CHUNG UN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1994 |