THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 13:03:10 PM
Gojer, Julian Abel Constantine
CPSO#:
65873
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Aug 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Aug 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Mysore University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Ml-4283 Village Centre Crt
Mississauga ON L4Z 1S2
Phone: (416) 323-9939
Fax: (416) 323-3166
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:14 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIAN ABEL CONSTANTINE GOJER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOJER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1992 |